Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Philippe Carriquiry, M.E.P. †

Deceased

Apostolic Administrator Emeritus of Xichang [Ningyüan], China


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 Dec 1911Born
7 Jul 193523.5Ordained PriestPriest of La Société des Missions Etrangères
1951²39.0AppointedApostolic Administrator of Xichang [Ningyüan], China
1954¹42.0ResignedApostolic Administrator of Xichang [Ningyüan], China
23 Dec 196048.9DiedApostolic Administrator Emeritus of Xichang [Ningyüan], China

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Philippe Carriquiry
Father Philippe Carriquiry M.E.P. (born , died ) Apostolic Administrator Emeritus of Xichang [Ningyüan]

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAlçay-Béhéty, Diocese of Bayonne (-Lescar e Oloron), France
Death PlaceMontbeton

  • a priest for 25.4 years

Source(s):
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 27 Dec 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.6, 19 Dec 2019; Data: 28 Dec 2019

Quantcast