Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Basilio Antonio Carrasco y Hernando, O. de M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Ibiza


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Jun 1783BornDurón
26 Mar 183147.7SelectedBishop of Ibiza, Spain
30 Sep 183148.2ConfirmedBishop of Ibiza, Spain
1 Jan 183248.5Ordained BishopBishop of Ibiza, Spain
4 Apr 185268.8DiedBishop of Ibiza, Spain

MicroData Summary for Basilio Antonio Carrasco y Hernando:
Bishop Basilio Antonio Carrasco y Hernando O. de M. (born , died ) Bishop of Ibiza

  • a bishop for 20.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 221
  • b/c2: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 148, Number 804

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015