Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Luis Zapata de Cárdenas, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Santafé en Nueva Granada


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1510BornLlerena, Spain
8 Jan 157060.0AppointedArchbishop of Santafé en Nueva Granada, Colombia
May 157161.3Ordained BishopArchbishop of Santafé en Nueva Granada, Colombia
24 Feb 159080.1DiedArchbishop of Santafé en Nueva Granada, Colombia

MicroData Summary for Luis Zapata de Cárdenas:
Archbishop Luis Zapata de Cárdenas O.F.M. (died ) Archbishop of Santafé en Nueva Granada

  • a bishop for 18.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013