Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Folignus Carboni

Deceased

Bishop of Fiesole, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
14 Mar 1337AppointedBishop of Fiesole, Italy
30 Mar 1337Ordained BishopBishop of Fiesole, Italy
17 Jun 1349DiedBishop of Fiesole, Italy

MicroData Summary for Folignus Carboni
Bishop Folignus Carboni (died ) Bishop of Fiesole

EventPlace
Ordained BishopAvignon, Diocese of Avignon, France

  • a bishop for 12.2 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 248
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 116, Number 10,272

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 19 Sep 2019

Quantcast