Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Antonio Cardinal Carafa

Deceased

Cardinal-Priest of Santi Giovanni e Paolo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1538BornNaples, Italy
24 Mar 156830.2Elevated to Cardinal
5 Apr 156830.3InstalledCardinal-Deacon of Sant’Eusebio
8 Apr 157335.3AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria in Cosmedin
8 Nov 157739.9AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria in Via Lata
12 Dec 158345.9AppointedCardinal-Priest of Sant’Eusebio
28 Nov 158446.9AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santi Giovanni e Paolo
13 Jan 159153.0DiedCardinal-Priest of Santi Giovanni e Paolo

MicroData Summary for Antonio Carafa:
Cardinal Antonio Carafa (died ) Cardinal-Priest of Santi Giovanni e Paolo

  • a cardinal for 22.8 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 24 Mar 1568

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013