Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alberto Capriano

Deceased

Bishop of Alba (Pompea), Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
30 Jul 1590AppointedBishop of Alba (Pompea), Italy
16 Sep 1590Ordained BishopBishop of Alba (Pompea), Italy
23 Jan 1595DiedBishop of Alba (Pompea), Italy

MicroData Summary for Alberto Capriano
Bishop Alberto Capriano (died ) Bishop of Alba (Pompea)

EventPlace
Ordained BishopMantova, Diocese of Mantova

  • a bishop for 4.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 100
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1590, Number 7

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018