Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alessandro Andreasi

Deceased

Bishop of Mantova, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
11 Mar 1577AppointedBishop of Casale Monferrato, Italy
14 Nov 1583AppointedBishop of Mantova, Italy
23 Mar 1593DiedBishop of Mantova, Italy

MicroData Summary for Alessandro Andreasi
Bishop Alessandro Andreasi (died ) Bishop of Mantova

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 155, and Page 234
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,577, Number 9*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast