Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father JŠn Čapla, S.D.B.

Superior Emeritus of Baku, Azerbaijan

Priest of Salesians of Saint John Bosco


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Apr 1957 Born
18 Jan 198527.7Ordained PriestPriest of Salesians of Saint John Bosco
18 Jul 200346.2AppointedSuperior of Baku, Azerbaijan
5 Nov 200952.5ResignedSuperior of Baku, Azerbaijan

MicroData Summary for JŠn Čapla
Father JŠn Čapla S.D.B. (born ) Superior Emeritus of Baku

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBratislava, Slovakia

Please contact the Father through the Mission "Sui Iuris" of Baku.

  • a priest for years

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 5 Nov 2009

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018