Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Arnaud de Canteloup

Deceased

Cardinal-Priest of San Marcello


Events

DateEventTitle
24 Jul 1305AppointedArchbishop of Bordeaux, France
15 Dec 1305AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Marcello
15 Dec 1305Elevated to Cardinal
14 Dec 1313DiedCardinal-Priest of San Marcello

MicroData Summary for Arnaud de Canteloup
Archbishop Arnaud de Canteloup (died ) Cardinal-Priest of San Marcello

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCanteloupe, Saint-Estéphe, Archdiocese of Bordeaux, France
Death PlaceAvignon, Diocese of Avignon, France

  • a cardinal for 7.9 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 150
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 15 Dec 1305

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 21 May 2019

Quantcast