Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Nicola Cardinal Canali

Deceased

Major Penitentiary of the Apostolic Penitentiary

Cardinal-Deacon of San Nicola in Carcere

Priest of Roma {Rome}

Grand Master of the Equestrian Order of the Holy Sepulchre of Jerusalem

President of the Pontifical Commission for Vatican City State


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Jun 1874BornRieti
31 Mar 190025.8Ordained PriestPriest of Roma {Rome}, Italy
21 Mar 190833.7AppointedOfficial of the Secretariat of State
24 Sep 191440.2AppointedSecretary of the Congregation of Ceremonies
27 Jun 192652.0AppointedOfficial of the Congregation of the Holy Office
16 Dec 193561.5Elevated to Cardinal
19 Dec 193561.5AppointedCardinal-Deacon of San Nicola in Carcere
20 Mar 193964.7AppointedPresident of the Pontifical Commission for Vatican City State
15 Oct 194167.3AppointedMajor Penitentiary of the Apostolic Penitentiary
25 Dec 194975.5AppointedGrand Master of the Equestrian Order of the Holy Sepulchre of Jerusalem
3 Aug 196187.1DiedPriest of Roma {Rome}, Italy

MicroData Summary for Nicola Canali:
Nicola Cardinal Canali (born , died ) Major Penitentiary of Apostolic Penitentiary

  • a priest for 61.3 years
  • a cardinal for 25.6 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
Code: web_b, v3.0.1, 18 Dec 2014; Data: 18 Dec 2014