Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Campeggi

Deceased

Bishop of Bologna, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1513¹Born
27 May 153724.4Ordained BishopBishop of Poreč (Parenzo), Croatia
28 May 153724.4AppointedBishop of Poreč (Parenzo), Croatia
6 Mar 155340.1AppointedBishop of Bologna, Italy
2 Aug 156047.5AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Florence (Tuscany), Italy
28 Nov 156047.9AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Spain
10 May 156148.3AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Portugal
1563²50.0ResignedApostolic Nuncio to Portugal
17 Sep 156350.7DiedBishop of Bologna, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Campeggi (VIAF: 16447776)
Bishop Giovanni Campeggi (born 1513, died ) Bishop of Bologna

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBologna, Diocese of Bologna
Ordained BishopRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a bishop for 26.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • nunc: Les Nonciatures Apostoliques Permanentes (Biaudet), Page 258
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 270
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1537, Number 11

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018