Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Lorenzo Campeggi

Deceased

Bishop of Cervia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1547¹BornBologna
May 1577³30.3AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Naples, Italy
5 Jan 158033.0ResignedApostolic Nuncio to Naples, Italy
6 May 158134.3AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Venice, Italy
8 Jan 158235.0AppointedBishop of Cervia, Italy
22 Jun 158538.4ResignedApostolic Nuncio to Venice, Italy
6 Nov 158538.8DiedBishop of Cervia, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Lorenzo Campeggi (VIAF: 90259249)
Bishop Lorenzo Campeggi (born 1547, died ) Bishop of Cervia

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 163
  • nunc: Les Nonciatures Apostoliques Permanentes, Page 258

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 3 Oct 2016