Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Filippo Cardinal Calandrini

Deceased

Bishop of Bologna, Italy

Cardinal-Bishop of Porto e Santa Rufina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1403²Born
18 Dec 144744.9AppointedBishop of Bologna, Italy
20 Dec 144845.9Elevated to Cardinal
3 Jan 144946.0AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Susanna
24 Nov 145148.8AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Lorenzo in Lucina
14 Oct 146865.7AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Albano
30 Aug 147168.6AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Porto e Santa Rufina
18 Jul 147673.5DiedBishop of Bologna, Italy

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Filippo Calandrini
Filippo Cardinal Calandrini (born 1403, died ) Bishop of Bologna

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSarzana

  • a cardinal for 27.5 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 20 Dec 1448

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018