Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Pierre Cadoet

Deceased

Archbishop of Bourges, France


Events

DateEventTitle
7 Aug 1482AppointedArchbishop of Bourges, France
27 Oct 1482Ordained BishopArchbishop of Bourges, France
31 Aug 1492DiedArchbishop of Bourges, France

MicroData Summary for Pierre Cadoet
Archbishop Pierre Cadoet (died ) Archbishop of Bourges

EventPlace
Ordained BishopFriars Minor, Church, Tours, Archdiocese of Tours

  • a bishop for 9.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 107
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 210, Number 17,308
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1482, Number 11

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 19 Sep 2019

Quantcast