Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Hélie Cardinal de Bourdeilles, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Tours

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Lucia in Orphea


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1413¹BornAgonac
18 Nov 143724.9AppointedBishop of Périgueux (Vesuna), France
13 Apr 143825.3Ordained BishopBishop of Périgueux (Vesuna), France
3 Aug 144734.6InstalledBishop of Périgueux (Vesuna), France
16 May 146855.4AppointedArchbishop of Tours, France
23 Dec 146856.0InstalledArchbishop of Tours, France
15 Nov 148370.9Elevated to Cardinal
15 Nov 148370.9AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Lucia in Orphea
5 Jul 148471.5DiedArchbishop of Tours, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Hélie de Bourdeilles:
Cardinal Hélie de Bourdeilles O.F.M. (died ) Archbishop of Tours

  • a bishop for 46.2 years
  • a cardinal for .6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 2, Page 215
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 120, Number 10,739
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 15 Nov 1483

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013