Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Afonso de Castelo-Branco

Deceased

Bishop of Coimbra, Portugal


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1522¹Born
5 Jun 158159.4AppointedBishop of Faro {Algarve}, Portugal
3 Jun 158563.4AppointedBishop of Coimbra, Portugal
12 May 161593.3DiedBishop of Coimbra, Portugal

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Afonso de Castelo-Branco (VIAF: 99854484)
Bishop Afonso de Castelo-Branco (born 1522, died ) Bishop of Coimbra

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSantiago do Cacém
Death PlaceCoimbra, Diocese of Coimbra

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 300, and Page 171
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1581, Number 11*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018