Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francisco Antonio Caballero

Deceased

Bishop of Segovia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1635Born
16 Dec 168247.9SelectedBishop of Segovia, Spain
8 Mar 168348.1ConfirmedBishop of Segovia, Spain
4 Jul 168348.5Ordained BishopBishop of Segovia, Spain
168449.0DiedBishop of Segovia, Spain

MicroData Summary for Francisco Antonio Caballero:
Bishop Francisco Antonio Caballero , Bishop of Segovia

  • a bishop for .4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 201, Number 16,447
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 350
  • b: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 225, Number 1,393

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015