Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Sebastián de Arévalo y Torres, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Osma


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1619²BornNava de Coca
16 May 167253.4AppointedBishop of Mondońedo, Spain
20 Apr 168263.3AppointedBishop of Osma, Spain
20 Jan 170485.1DiedBishop of Osma, Spain

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Sebastián de Arévalo y Torres:
Bishop Sebastián de Arévalo y Torres O.F.M. (died ) Bishop of Osma

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi
  • b: Episcopologio Espańol, Volume 1500, Page 209, Number 1,306

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 30 Oct 2013