Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Thomas Button

Deceased

Bishop of Exeter, England, Great Britain


Events

DateEventTitle
30 Nov 1291AppointedBishop of Exeter, England, Great Britain
16 Mar 1292Ordained BishopBishop of Exeter, England, Great Britain
26 Sep 1307DiedBishop of Exeter, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for Thomas Button
Bishop Thomas Button (died ) Bishop of Exeter

EventPlace
Ordained BishopCanterbury, Archdiocese of Canterbury, England

  • a bishop for 15.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 243
  • ob/c2: Registrum Sacrum Anglicanum, Page 68
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 1, Page 370
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 84, Number 6,920

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast