Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Roland de Burgo (Burke)

Deceased

Bishop of Clonfert, Ireland


Events

DateEventTitle
18 May 1534AppointedBishop of Clonfert, Ireland
10 Jun 1537Ordained BishopBishop of Clonfert, Ireland
20 Jun 1580DiedBishop of Clonfert, Ireland

MicroData Summary for Roland de Burgo (Burke)
Bishop Roland de Burgo (Burke) (died ) Bishop of Clonfert

EventPlace
Ordained BishopSistine, Chapel, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a bishop for 43.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 170
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1537, Number 13

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018