Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alexander Bur

Deceased

Bishop of Moray, Scotland, Great Britain


Events

DateEventTitle
17 Dec 1362Ordained BishopBishop
23 Dec 1362AppointedBishop of Moray, Scotland, Great Britain
15 May 1397DiedBishop of Moray, Scotland, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for Alexander Bur
Bishop Alexander Bur (died ) Bishop of Moray

EventPlace
Ordained BishopAvignon, Diocese of Avignon, France

  • a bishop for 34.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 350
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 94, Number 7,966

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 22 Nov 2020

Quantcast