Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alexandre-Joseph-Alexis de Bruyère de Chalabre

Deceased

Bishop of Saint-Omer, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1736¹Born
14 Jun 177842.4SelectedBishop of Saint-Omer, France
20 Jul 177842.5ConfirmedBishop of Saint-Omer, France
9 Aug 177842.6Ordained BishopBishop of Saint-Omer, France
22 Nov 179660.8DiedBishop of Saint-Omer, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Alexandre-Joseph-Alexis de Bruyère de Chalabre
Bishop Alexandre-Joseph-Alexis de Bruyère de Chalabre (born 1736, died ) Bishop of Saint-Omer

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCastelnaudary

  • a bishop for 18.2 years

Source(s):
  • b: Les Évèques et les Archevèques de France
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1778, Number 23
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 106

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018