Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Nicolas de Briroy

Deceased

Bishop of Coutances, France


Events

DateEventTitle
21 Apr 1589SelectedBishop of Coutances, France
15 Sep 1597ConfirmedBishop of Coutances, France
7 Dec 1597Ordained BishopBishop of Coutances, France
22 Mar 1620DiedBishop of Coutances, France

MicroData Summary for Nicolas de Briroy
Bishop Nicolas de Briroy (died ) Bishop of Coutances

EventPlace
Birth PlaceFierville, Manche
Ordained BishopS. Germain des Pres, Paris, Diocese of Paris
Death PlaceCoutances, Diocese of Coutances

  • a bishop for 22.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 176
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1597, Number 17

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018