Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Thomas Bradwardin

Deceased

Archbishop of Canterbury, England, Great Britain


Events

DateEventTitle
19 Jun 1349AppointedArchbishop of Canterbury, England, Great Britain
19 Jul 1349Ordained BishopArchbishop of Canterbury, England, Great Britain
26 Aug 1349DiedArchbishop of Canterbury, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for Thomas Bradwardin
Archbishop Thomas Bradwardin (died ) Archbishop of Canterbury

EventPlace
Ordained BishopAvignon

  • a bishop for .1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Registrum Sacrum Anglicanum, Page 76
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 1, Page 18
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 83, Number 6,793

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast