Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Lorenzo Prospero Cardinal Bottini

Deceased

Priest of the Roman Curia - Other

Cardinal-Deacon of Sant’Adriano al Foro


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Mar 1737BornLucca, Italy
8 Mar 181679.0Elevated to CardinalIn Pectore
1 Oct 181780.5Elevated to Cardinal
1 Oct 181780.5AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Sant’Adriano al Foro
11 Aug 181881.4DiedPriest of the Roman Curia - Other

MicroData Summary for Lorenzo Prospero Bottini:
Lorenzo Prospero Cardinal Bottini (born , died ) Priest of Roman Curia - Other

  • a cardinal for 2.4 years

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015