Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Charles de Bony

Deceased

Bishop of AngoulÍme, France


Events

DateEventTitle
4 Jun 1567AppointedBishop of AngoulÍme, France
22 Aug 1574Ordained BishopBishop of AngoulÍme, France
14 Dec 1603DiedBishop of AngoulÍme, France

MicroData Summary for Charles de Bony
Bishop Charles de Bony (died ) Bishop of AngoulÍme

EventPlace
Ordained BishopSaint-Victor, Abbey, Paris, Diocese of Paris

  • a bishop for 29.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 193
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 209, Number 17,203
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations …piscopales, Year 1574, Number 13

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018