Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Giovanni Cardinal Bona

Deceased

Cardinal-Priest of San Bernardo alle Terme


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Oct 1609Born
163323.2Ordained PriestPriest
29 Nov 166960.1Elevated to Cardinal
19 May 167060.6InstalledCardinal-Priest of San Bernardo alle Terme
28 Oct 167465.0DiedCardinal-Priest of San Bernardo alle Terme

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Bona
Giovanni Cardinal Bona (born , died ) Cardinal-Priest of San Bernardo alle Terme

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMondový, Italy

  • a priest for 41.8 years
  • a cardinal for 4.9 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 29 Nov 1669

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018