Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Geoffroy de Billy

Deceased

Bishop of Laon, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1536²Born
19 Feb 160165.1AppointedBishop of Laon, France
6 May 160165.3Ordained BishopBishop of Laon, France
28 Mar 161276.2DiedBishop of Laon, France

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Geoffroy de Billy
Bishop Geoffroy de Billy (born 1536, died ) Bishop of Laon

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGuise

  • a bishop for 10.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1601, Number 9

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018