Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Hovsep Joseph Bezazian (Bezouzou)

Apostolic Administrator of Greece (Armenian)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Mar 1961 Born
21 Sep 198625.5Ordained PriestPriest
21 Mar 201554.0AppointedApostolic Administrator of Greece (Armenian)

MicroData Summary for Hovsep Joseph Bezazian (Bezouzou)
Father Hovsep Joseph Bezazian (Bezouzou) (born ) Apostolic Administrator of Greece

Please contact the Father through the Ordinariate of Greece (Armenian).

  • a priest for years

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 21 Mar 2015

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast