Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Matteo Bertolini

Deceased

Archbishop of Sassari, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Jul 1677Born
5 Jun 170022.8Ordained DeaconDeacon
13 Jun 170022.8Ordained PriestPriest
28 Jan 173355.5SelectedBishop of Alghero, Italy
5 Mar 173355.6ConfirmedBishop of Alghero, Italy
20 Sep 174164.1SelectedArchbishop of Sassari, Italy
27 Nov 174164.3ConfirmedArchbishop of Sassari, Italy
9 Nov 175073.2DiedArchbishop of Sassari, Italy

MicroData Summary for Matteo Bertolini
Archbishop Matteo Bertolini (born , died ) Archbishop of Sassari

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMonreale

  • a priest for 50.4 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 76, and Page 422
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1733, Number 35

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018