Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Girolamo Bentivoglio

Deceased

Bishop of Corneto (Tarquinia) e Montefiascone, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1520¹Born
7 Oct 158060.7AppointedBishop of Corneto (Tarquinia) e Montefiascone, Italy
13 Nov 158060.8Ordained BishopBishop of Corneto (Tarquinia) e Montefiascone, Italy
12 Apr 160181.2DiedBishop of Corneto (Tarquinia) e Montefiascone, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Girolamo Bentivoglio
Bishop Girolamo Bentivoglio (born 1520, died ) Bishop of Corneto (Tarquinia) e Montefiascone

EventPlace
Ordained BishopS. Silvestre in Monte Cavallo, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a bishop for 20.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 249
  • ob/c2+: CB, 29 Sep 2011
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1580, Number 16

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018