Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Miguel de Benavides, O.P. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Manila, Philippines


Events

DateEventTitle
30 Aug 1595AppointedBishop of Nueva Segovia, Philippines
Nov 1597³Ordained BishopBishop of Nueva Segovia, Philippines
7 Oct 1602AppointedArchbishop of Manila, Philippines
26 Jul 1605DiedArchbishop of Manila, Philippines

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Miguel de Benavides (VIAF: 87612462)
Archbishop Miguel de Benavides O.P. (died ) Archbishop of Manila

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCarrión de los Condes, Diocese of Palencia, Spain
Ordained BishopSan Agustín, Convent, México, Archdiocese of México, Federal District

  • a bishop for 7.7 years

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 195, Number 15,832
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 140, Number 12,393
  • b/c2: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 109, Number 695
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 261, and Page 230
  • b/c2?: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1597, Number 13

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018