Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Gotius (Gozzio) Cardinal Battaglia

Deceased

Titular Patriarch of Constantinople

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Prisca


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1270¹Born
14 Jun 133565.4AppointedTitular Patriarch of Constantinople
20 Feb 133666.1Ordained BishopTitular Patriarch of Constantinople
18 Dec 133868.9AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Prisca
18 Dec 133868.9Elevated to Cardinal
10 Jun 134878.4DiedCardinal-Priest of Santa Prisca

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Gotius (Gozzio) Battaglia
Gotius (Gozzio) Cardinal Battaglia (born 1270, died ) Titular Patriarch of Constantinople

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRimini, Diocese of Rimini, Italy
Ordained BishopAvignon, Diocese of Avignon, France
Death PlaceAvignon, Diocese of Avignon, France
Buried Place (Original)S. Agnese, Church, Rimini, Diocese of Rimini, Italy

  • a bishop for 12.3 years
  • a cardinal for 9.4 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 206
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 137, Number 12,208
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 18 Dec 1338

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 19 Sep 2019

Quantcast