Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Patriarch Gerard (Bastet) de Crussol

Deceased

Titular Patriarch of Antiochia {Antioch}

Archbishop (Personal Title) of Valence and Die


Events

DateEventTitle
9 Jun 1466AppointedArchbishop of Tours, France
13 Oct 1466Ordained BishopArchbishop of Tours, France
13 May 1468AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Valence and Die, France
4 Dec 1471AppointedTitular Patriarch of Antiochia {Antioch}
28 Aug 1472DiedBishop of Valence and Die, France

MicroData Summary for Gerard (Bastet) de Crussol:
Patriarch Gerard (Bastet) de Crussol (died ) Titular Patriarch of Antiochia {Antioch}

  • a bishop for 5.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 2, Page 258, and Page 262
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 2, Page 89
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 105, Number 9,130

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013