Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pietro Barozzi

Deceased

Bishop of Padova {Padua}, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1441¹Born
4 Sep 147130.6AppointedBishop of Belluno, Italy
14 Mar 148746.2AppointedBishop of Padova {Padua}, Italy
10 Jan 150766.0DiedBishop of Padova {Padua}, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Pietro Barozzi (VIAF: 88877519)
Bishop Pietro Barozzi (born 1441, died ) Bishop of Padova {Padua}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVenezia, Patriarchate of Venezia {Venice}
Ordained BishopRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 203, Number 16,669
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 267
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,471, Number 7
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 210, and Page 103

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast