Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Jakob von Baden

Deceased

Archbishop-Elect of Trier, Germany


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Jun 1471Born
27 Dec 149928.5SelectedCoadjutor Archbishop of Trier, Germany
11 Sep 150029.2ConfirmedCoadjutor Archbishop of Trier, Germany
9 Feb 150331.6SucceededArchbishop of Trier, Germany
27 Apr 151139.8DiedArchbishop-Elect of Trier, Germany

MicroData Summary for Jakob von Baden (VIAF: 60151275)
Father Jakob von Baden (born , died ) Archbishop-Elect of Trier

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1500, Number 31*
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 255

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast