Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Dionisio Cardinal Bardaxí y Azara

Deceased

Priest of the Roman Curia - Other

Cardinal-Priest of Sant’Agnese fuori le mura


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Oct 1760BornPuyarruego, Spain
178524.2Ordained PriestPriest
8 Mar 181655.4Elevated to Cardinal
8 Mar 181655.4AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santi XII Apostoli
27 Sep 182262.0AppointedCardinal-Priest of Sant’Agnese fuori le mura
3 Dec 182666.2DiedPriest of the Roman Curia - Other

MicroData Summary for Dionisio Bardaxí y Azara:
Cardinal Dionisio Bardaxí y Azara (born , died ) Priest of Roman Curia - Other

  • a priest for 41.9 years
  • a cardinal for 10.7 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 8 Mar 1816

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013