Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Decio Cardinal Azzolini (Jr.)

Deceased

Secretary Emeritus of the Secretariat of State

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Prassede


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Apr 1623BornFermo, Italy
2 Mar 165430.9Elevated to Cardinal
23 Mar 165430.9InstalledCardinal-Deacon of Sant’Adriano al Foro
25 Jun 166744.2AppointedSecretary of State
12 Mar 166844.9AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Sant’Eustachio
9 Dec 166946.7ResignedSecretary of State
15 Feb 168359.8AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria in Trastevere
13 Nov 168461.6AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Prassede
8 Jun 168966.2DiedSecretary Emeritus of the Secretariat of State

MicroData Summary for Decio Azzolini (Jr.):
Cardinal Decio Azzolini (Jr.) (born , died ) Secretary Emeritus of State

  • a cardinal for 35.3 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 2 Mar 1654

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013