Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Fortius d’Auch

Deceased

Bishop of Poitiers, France


Events

DateEventTitle
29 Mar 1314AppointedBishop of Poitiers, France
17 Oct 1316Ordained BishopBishop of Poitiers, France
8 Mar 1357DiedBishop of Poitiers, France

MicroData Summary for Fortius d’Auch
Bishop Fortius d’Auch (died ) Bishop of Poitiers

EventPlace
Ordained BishopAvignon

  • a bishop for 40.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 399
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 101, Number 8,710

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.1, 10 Dec 2020; Data: 19 Dec 2020

Quantcast