Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Juan Alzˇloras (Arzolaras), O.S.H. †

Deceased

Bishop of Islas Canarias {Canary Islands}, Spain


Events

DateEventTitle
15 Feb 1566AppointedArchbishop of Santo Domingo, Dominican Republic
17 Sep 1568AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Islas Canarias {Canary Islands}, Spain
7 May 1574DiedBishop of Islas Canarias {Canary Islands}, Spain

MicroData Summary for Juan Alzˇloras (Arzolaras)
Archbishop Juan Alzˇloras (Arzolaras) O.S.H. (died ) Bishop of Islas Canarias {Canary Islands}

EventPlace
Birth Place

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 150, and Page 187
  • b: Episcopologio Espa˝ol, Volume 1,500, Page 77, Number 457
  • b: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1,566, Number 3*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast