Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Filippo Arrivabene

Deceased

Titular Bishop of Monembasia


Events

DateEventTitle
1 Oct 1520AppointedTitular Bishop of Monembasia
14 Oct 1520Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Monembasia

MicroData Summary for Filippo Arrivabene
Bishop Filippo Arrivabene , Titular Bishop of Monembasia

EventPlace
Ordained BishopChapel of the Consecrator, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 248
  • ob/c2: CB, 7 Aug 2016
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1520, Number 6

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 19 Sep 2019

Quantcast