Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop José de Argáiz Pérez

Deceased

Archbishop of Granada


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Mar 1592BornArnedo
1616²23.8Ordained PriestPriest
1 Jul 164149.3AppointedBishop of Almería, Spain
16 Mar 164250.0Ordained BishopBishop of Almería, Spain
4 Dec 164553.7AppointedBishop of Ávila, Spain
27 Jul 165462.4AppointedArchbishop of Granada, Spain
28 May 166775.2DiedArchbishop of Granada, Spain

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for José de Argáiz Pérez:
Archbishop José de Argáiz Pérez (born , died ) Archbishop of Granada

  • a priest for 51.4 years
  • a bishop for 25.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 114, Number 10,056
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 201, Number 16,418
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 4, Page 65, and Page 79
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 4, Page 196
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Espańol, Volume 1500, Page 171, Number 1,066

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.7, 12 Jan 2014; data: 2 Mar 2014