Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Bartolomé Sebastián de Aroitia

Deceased

Archbishop of Tarragona, Spain


Events

DateEventTitle
9 Jan 1549AppointedBishop of Patti, Italy
24 Feb 1549Ordained BishopBishop of Patti, Italy
1 Oct 1567AppointedArchbishop of Tarragona, Spain
14 Apr 1568DiedArchbishop of Tarragona, Spain

MicroData Summary for Bartolomé Sebastián de Aroitia
Archbishop Bartolomé Sebastián de Aroitia (died ) Archbishop of Tarragona

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTorrelacárcel, Archdiocese of Zaragoza
Ordained BishopCathedral, Palermo, Archdiocese of Palermo, Italy

  • a bishop for 19.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 266, and Page 309
  • b: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 61, Number 346
  • ob/c2: CB, 17 Mar 2014
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1549, Number 3

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018