Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Niccol˛ Aragonio (Aragona)

Deceased

Bishop of Ascoli Piceno


Events

DateEventTitle
3 Oct 1578AppointedBishop of Ripatransone, Italy
Nov 1578²Ordained BishopBishop of Ripatransone, Italy
3 Aug 1579AppointedBishop of Ascoli Piceno, Italy
Jul 1586³DiedBishop of Ascoli Piceno, Italy

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Niccol˛ Aragonio (Aragona)
Bishop Niccol˛ Aragonio (Aragona) (died Jul 1586) Bishop of Ascoli Piceno

  • a bishop for 7.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 285
  • c2+: AT, 9 Jul 2016
  • b/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 229, Number 18,959

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 28 Sep 2016