Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francisco de Aragón

Deceased

Bishop of Cefalù


Events

DateEventTitle
7 Jun 1525AppointedBishop of Cefalù, Italy
30 Jul 1525Ordained BishopBishop of Cefalù, Italy
22 Jun 1561DiedBishop of Cefalù, Italy

MicroData Summary for Francisco de Aragón:
Bishop Francisco de Aragón (died ) Bishop of Cefalù

  • a bishop for 35.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 3, Page 163
  • b/c2: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 38, Number 180

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.4, 11 Nov 2013; data: 13 Nov 2013