Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Tommaso Cardinal Ammannati

Deceased

Cardinal-Priest of San Clemente

Titular See: (Pseudocardinal)


Events

DateEventTitle
9 Oct 1374AppointedBishop of Nemosia (Limasol), Greece
21 Oct 1379AppointedArchbishop of Napoli {Naples}, Italy
12 Jul 1385AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Prassede
12 Jul 1385Elevated to Cardinal
1391¹AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Clemente
9 Dec 1396DiedCardinal-Priest of San Clemente

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Tommaso Ammannati
Tommaso Cardinal Ammannati (died ) Cardinal-Priest of San Clemente

EventPlace
Birth PlacePistoia, Diocese of Pistoia, Italy
Death PlaceAvignon

  • a cardinal for 11.4 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 367, and Page 360
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 12 Jul 1385

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 9 Jul 2021

Quantcast