Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Nils Allesson

Deceased

Archbishop of Uppsala, Sweden


Events

DateEventTitle
31 Jul 1295Ordained BishopArchbishop of Uppsala, Sweden
17 Aug 1295AppointedArchbishop of Uppsala, Sweden
4 Feb 1305DiedArchbishop of Uppsala, Sweden

MicroData Summary for Nils Allesson
Archbishop Nils Allesson (died ) Archbishop of Uppsala

EventPlace
Ordained BishopAvignon, Diocese of Avignon, France

  • a bishop for 9.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 508
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 239, Number 20,020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 14 Apr 2019

Quantcast