Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Robert Aldridge (Aldrich)

Deceased

Bishop of Carlisle, England, Great Britain


Events

DateEventTitle
18 Jul 1537SelectedBishop of Carlisle, England, Great Britain
19 Aug 1537Ordained BishopBishop of Carlisle, England, Great Britain
1554²ConfirmedBishop of Carlisle, England, Great Britain
5 Mar 1556DiedBishop of Carlisle, England, Great Britain

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Robert Aldridge (Aldrich)
Bishop Robert Aldridge (Aldrich) (died ) Bishop of Carlisle

EventPlace
Ordained BishopSavoie, Chapel, London, Diocese of London, England

  • a bishop for 18.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 3, Page 240
  • b/c2+: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 153
  • ob/c2+: Registrum Sacrum Anglicanum, Page 101
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1537, Number 18

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast