Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bernard Cardinal d’Albi

Deceased

Cardinal-Bishop of Porto e Santa Rufina


Events

DateEventTitle
31 Jan 1336AppointedBishop of Rodez, France
18 Dec 1338AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Ciriaco alle Terme Diocleziane
18 Dec 1338Elevated to Cardinal
19 Jan 1349AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Porto e Santa Rufina
23 Nov 1350DiedCardinal-Bishop of Porto e Santa Rufina

MicroData Summary for Bernard d’Albi
Bernard Cardinal d’Albi (died ) Cardinal-Bishop of Porto e Santa Rufina

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSaverdun, Diocese of Pamiers (-Couserans-Mirepoix), France

  • a cardinal for 11.9 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 18 Dec 1338

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.2.2, 5 Oct 2018; Data: 5 Oct 2018

Quantcast