Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Arnau (Arnaldo) Alberti (Albertini)

Deceased

Bishop of Patti


Events

DateEventTitle
12 Sep 1534AppointedBishop of Patti, Italy
27 Dec 1535Ordained BishopBishop of Patti, Italy
7 Oct 1544DiedBishop of Patti, Italy

MicroData Summary for Arnau (Arnaldo) Alberti (Albertini):
Bishop Arnau (Arnaldo) Alberti (Albertini) (died ) Bishop of Patti

  • a bishop for 8.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 3, Page 266
  • b/c2: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 46, Number 238
  • b/c2: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1535, Number 15

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 4 Apr 2014